: KSU (I) Unit President, St. Paul's College, Kalamassery (1982-83); College Union Chairman, St. Paul's College, Kalamassery (1983-85); General Secretary, KSU (I) Cochin City (1983-85); General Secretary, KSU (I), Ernakulam District (1985-93); General Secretary (1993-2002), Youth Congress (I) Ernakulam District; Member, Congress (I), District Committee, Ernakulam (1992); General Secretary, District Congress Committee, Ernakulam (2004-15); President, District Congress Committee, Ernakulam (since 12th December 2016); District President, Archery Association (since 2007); Councillor, Kochi Municipal Corporation (since 1995-2019); Chairman, Development Standing Committee, Kochi Municipal Corporation (2010-15); Deputy Mayor, Kochi Municipal Corporation (2 times) (20.11.2002-22.08.2003 and 2015-19). Newly elected to KLA. Elected in the by-election held on 21.10.2019 following the resignation of Shri. Hibi Eden who got elected as the Member of Lok Sabha.